Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Adolf Namszanowski

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Germany, Military

Titular Bishop of Agathopolis

Titular See: (Prussia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1820Born
24 May 184625.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
1 Jun 184625.8Ordained PriestPriest of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
22 May 186847.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Germany, Military
22 Jun 186847.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Agathopolis
11 Oct 186848.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Agathopolis
28 May 187251.7ResignedVicar Apostolic of Germany, Military
22 Mar 190079.6DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Germany, Military

MicroData Summary for Franz Adolf Namszanowski
Bishop Franz Adolf Namszanowski (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Germany, Military

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGdansk

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a bishop for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 80

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 Jan 2017