Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Frenzel

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland

Titular Bishop of Areopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1790Born
7 Mar 181827.5Ordained PriestPriest of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
27 Sep 185262.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
27 Sep 185262.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Areopolis
6 Mar 185362.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Areopolis
3 Apr 187382.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland

MicroData Summary for Anton Frenzel (VIAF: 80424671)
Bishop Anton Frenzel (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Warmia (Ermland)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKostenthal

  • a priest for 55.0 years
  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 118
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,216
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1853, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Jan 2017