Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Gro▀mann (Grossmann)

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Warmia (Ermland)

Titular Bishop of Amyzon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1783BornRobawen
16 Mar 180320.0Ordained PriestPriest of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
17 Jun 184461.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
17 Jun 184461.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Amyzon
29 Sep 184461.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amyzon
5 May 185269.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland

MicroData Summary for Franz Gro▀mann (Grossmann):
Bishop Franz Gro▀mann (Grossmann) (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Warmia (Ermland)

  • a priest for 49.1 years
  • a bishop for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,391
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 72
  • ob: CB, 3 Jan 2014
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015