Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ignacy Błażej Franciszek Krasicki

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1735Born
21 Sep 175823.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
2 Feb 175923.9Ordained PriestPriest of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
15 Oct 176631.6SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
1 Dec 176631.8ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
1 Dec 176631.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Verinopolis
15 Dec 176631.8SucceededBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
28 Dec 176631.9Ordained BishopBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
13 Apr 179560.1SelectedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
18 Dec 179560.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
17 Mar 179661.1InstalledArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
14 Mar 180166.1DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

MicroData Summary for Ignacy Błażej Franciszek Krasicki
Archbishop Ignacy Błażej Franciszek Krasicki (born , died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDubiecko

  • a priest for 42.1 years
  • a bishop for 34.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1766, Number 45
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 226, and Page 432
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 438

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018