Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Ambroży Geritz

Deceased

Bishop of Warmia (Ermland)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1783BornSeeburg
9 Mar 180622.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
5 Apr 180623.0Ordained PriestPriest of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
27 Apr 184057.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
27 Apr 184057.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Abdera
23 Aug 184057.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abdera
21 Jun 184158.2SelectedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
27 Jan 184258.8ConfirmedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
26 Jun 184259.2InstalledBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
16 Aug 186784.3DiedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland

MicroData Summary for Józef Ambroży Geritz (VIAF: 64761111)
Bishop Józef Ambroży Geritz (born , died ) Bishop of Warmia (Ermland)

  • a priest for 61.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,198
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 55, and Page 389
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1840, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 Oct 2016