Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciszek Ksawery Rydzyński

Deceased

Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jul 1734³BornWyrzysk
17 Nov 175723.3Ordained PriestPriest of Poznań, Poland
18 Sep 178046.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Poznań, Poland
18 Sep 178046.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Nilopolis
14 Jan 178146.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nilopolis
10 Oct 179561.2SelectedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
18 Dec 179561.4ConfirmedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
17 Sep 179662.1InstalledBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
17 Oct 181480.2DiedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franciszek Ksawery Rydzyński:
Bishop Franciszek Ksawery Rydzyński (born , died ) Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

  • a priest for 56.9 years
  • a bishop for 33.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,460
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1781, Number 4
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 189, and Page 311
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 454

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 16 Jan 2016