Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ignacy Jan Zygmunt von Raczyński

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Gniezno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1741BornMaloszyn
15 Aug 176019.0ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
31 Jul 177029.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
177533.4IncardinatedPriest of Poznań, Poland
12 Sep 179453.1AppointedBishop of Poznań, Poland
9 Nov 179453.3Ordained BishopBishop of Poznań, Poland
26 Aug 180665.1AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
10 Dec 180766.4InstalledArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
22 Aug 181877.1RetiredArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
19 Feb 182381.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Gniezno, Poland

MicroData Summary for Ignacy Jan Zygmunt von Raczyński:
Archbishop Ignacy Jan Zygmunt von Raczyński (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Gniezno

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,770
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 204, and Page 389
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 347
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 14 Jan 2014