Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludwik Józef de Mathy

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Poznań

Titular Bishop of Tanis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1727³BornGedanen
20 Dec 174922.8Ordained PriestPriest
20 Sep 177952.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Poznań, Poland
20 Sep 177952.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Tanis
7 May 178053.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tanis
1801¹73.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Poznań, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ludwik Józef de Mathy:
Bishop Ludwik Józef de Mathy (born , died 1801) Auxiliary Bishop of Poznań

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,124
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 391, and Page 454
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1780, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 16 Jan 2016