Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Ferdinand von Rothkirch und Panthen

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

Titular Bishop of Paphus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1739BornHönnigsdorf
19 Mar 176323.6Ordained PriestPriest of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
25 Jun 178141.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
25 Jun 178141.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Paphus
19 Aug 178142.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Paphus
21 Apr 180565.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

MicroData Summary for Anton Ferdinand von Rothkirch und Panthen:
Bishop Anton Ferdinand von Rothkirch und Panthen (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,124
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1781, Number 19
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 327, and Page 453

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 30 Dec 2015