Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christoph Emanuel (Krzysztof Emanuel) von Schimonski-Schimoni

Deceased

Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1752BornBrzeznitz
1 Apr 177522.7Ordained PriestPriest of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
18 Dec 179745.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
18 Dec 179745.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Lerus
11 Feb 179845.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lerus
16 Oct 182371.2SelectedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
3 May 182471.8ConfirmedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
26 Aug 182472.1InstalledBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
27 Dec 183280.4DiedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

MicroData Summary for Christoph Emanuel (Krzysztof Emanuel) von Schimonski-Schimoni:
Bishop Christoph Emanuel (Krzysztof Emanuel) von Schimonski-Schimoni (born , died ) Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

  • a priest for 57.7 years
  • a bishop for 34.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,125
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 399

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013