Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignacy Bardziński

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno

Titular Bishop of Satala in Armenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1750BornGlaznów
23 Jun 177625.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Gniezno, Poland
21 Jul 177625.9Ordained PriestPriest of Gniezno, Poland
27 Mar 180958.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland
27 Mar 180958.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Satala in Armenia
2 Jul 180958.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Satala in Armenia
15 Dec 181363.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland

MicroData Summary for Ignacy Bardziński:
Bishop Ignacy Bardziński (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno

  • a priest for 37.4 years
  • a bishop for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Number 15,254
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 335

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013