Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanisław Żarnowiecki

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Poznań, Poland

Titular Bishop of Leuce


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1741Born
26 Jun 180564.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Poznań, Poland
26 Jun 180564.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Leuce
6 Apr 180664.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Leuce
25 Jan 180866.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Poznań, Poland

MicroData Summary for Stanisław Żarnowiecki (VIAF: 9147965770384081191)
Bishop Stanisław Żarnowiecki (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Poznań

EventPlace
Birth PlacePrzemyśl

  • a bishop for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,806, Number 7
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 237
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,963

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast