Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marcin von Dundin Sulgustowski (Dunin)

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno e Poznań


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1774BornWal
10 Jun 179722.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Kraków, Poland
23 Sep 179722.8Ordained PriestPriest of Kraków, Poland
15 Mar 183055.3SelectedArchbishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
28 Feb 183156.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
10 Jul 183156.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
26 Dec 184268.1DiedArchbishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland

MicroData Summary for Marcin von Dundin Sulgustowski (Dunin):
Archbishop Marcin von Dundin Sulgustowski (Dunin) (born , died ) Archbishop of Gniezno e Poznań

  • a priest for 45.2 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 204
  • b/c2+: CB, 3 Jan 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,056

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015