Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kajetan von Kowalski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań

Titular Bishop of Maximianopolis in Palaestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1769³BornPopówko
3 Mar 179222.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Poznań, Poland
7 Apr 179222.3Ordained PriestPriest of Poznań, Poland
15 Apr 183363.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
15 Apr 183363.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Maximianopolis in Palaestina
7 Jul 183363.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maximianopolis in Palaestina
13 Jan 184070.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Kajetan von Kowalski:
Bishop Kajetan von Kowalski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań

  • a priest for 47.8 years
  • a bishop for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 257

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 4 Jan 2014