Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Chełkowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań

Titular Bishop of Tricomia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1766BornPokrzywnica
25 Jul 179023.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Gniezno, Poland
18 Sep 179023.9Ordained PriestPriest of Gniezno, Poland
15 Apr 183366.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
15 Apr 183366.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tricomia
7 Jul 183366.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tricomia
30 Oct 183771.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland

MicroData Summary for Józef Chełkowski:
Bishop Józef Chełkowski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 4.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 377

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013