Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anzelm Wojciech Brodziszewski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań

Titular Bishop of Themiscyra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1779BornMurowana Goślina
10 May 180122.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Gniezno, Poland
19 Dec 180122.7Ordained PriestPriest of Gniezno, Poland
1 Mar 184161.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
1 Mar 184161.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Themiscyra
5 Sep 184162.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Themiscyra
10 Jul 186687.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland

MicroData Summary for Anzelm Wojciech Brodziszewski:
Bishop Anzelm Wojciech Brodziszewski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań

  • a priest for 64.6 years
  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 547
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 365

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013