Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Maria Johann Nepomuk von Fraunberg

Deceased

Archbishop of Bamberg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1768BornFraunberg
18 Dec 179123.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Regensburg, Germany
21 Dec 179123.2Ordained PriestPriest of Regensburg, Germany
28 Nov 181951.1SelectedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
27 Jun 182152.7ConfirmedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
11 Nov 182153.1Ordained BishopBishop of Augsburg, Germany
10 Mar 182455.4SelectedArchbishop of Bamberg, Germany
24 May 182455.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Bamberg, Germany
17 Jan 184273.3DiedArchbishop of Bamberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Joseph Maria Johann Nepomuk von Fraunberg:
Archbishop Joseph Maria Johann Nepomuk von Fraunberg (born , died ) Archbishop of Bamberg

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 95, and Page 104

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013