Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Pustett

Deceased

Bishop of Eichstätt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1764³BornHemau
7 Nov 178521.6ProfessedMember of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
12 Nov 178622.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
23 Sep 178723.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
180338.7IncardinatedPriest of Regensburg, Germany
10 Mar 182459.9SelectedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
24 May 182460.1ConfirmedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
3 Oct 182460.5Ordained BishopBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
24 Apr 182561.1DiedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Peter Pustett (VIAF: 95639451)
Bishop Peter Pustett (born , died ) Bishop of Eichstätt

  • a priest for 37.5 years
  • a bishop for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 190
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1824, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 6 Jun 2016