Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Friedrich Oesterreicher

Deceased

Bishop of Eichstätt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1771BornBamberg
4 Jan 179422.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Bamberg, Germany
24 Sep 179422.9Ordained PriestPriest of Bamberg, Germany
17 Nov 182352.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany
17 Nov 182352.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Dorylaëum
28 Dec 182352.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dorylaëum
22 May 182553.6SelectedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
27 Jun 182553.7ConfirmedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
9 Nov 182554.1InstalledBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
31 Jan 183563.3DiedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Friedrich Oesterreicher:
Bishop Johann Friedrich Oesterreicher (born , died ) Bishop of Eichstätt

  • a priest for 40.4 years
  • a bishop for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 179, and Page 191

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013