Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georg Anton von Stahl

Deceased

Bishop of Würzburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1805Born
10 Mar 182721.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Würzburg, Germany
10 Apr 183025.0Ordained PriestPriest of Würzburg, Germany
17 Apr 184035.0SelectedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
13 Jul 184035.2ConfirmedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
4 Oct 184035.5Ordained BishopBishop of Würzburg, Germany
13 Jul 187065.2DiedBishop of Würzburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Georg Anton von Stahl (VIAF: 52497617)
Bishop Georg Anton von Stahl (born , died ) Bishop of Würzburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStadtprozelten
Ordained BishopCathedral, Würzburg, Diocese of Würzburg

  • a priest for 40.2 years
  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 212
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1840, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Jan 2017