Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Joseph Blum

Deceased

Bishop of Limburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1808BornGeisenheim
16 May 183224.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Limburg, Germany
18 May 183224.1Ordained PriestPriest of Limburg, Germany
26 Jan 184233.8SelectedBishop of Limburg, Germany
23 May 184234.1ConfirmedBishop of Limburg, Germany
2 Oct 184234.5Ordained BishopBishop of Limburg, Germany
30 Dec 188476.7DiedBishop of Limburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Peter Joseph Blum:
Bishop Peter Joseph Blum (born , died ) Bishop of Limburg

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 42.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,210
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 239

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013