Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christoph Florentius Kött

Deceased

Bishop of Fulda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1801BornSt. Martin, France
15 Dec 182423.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Fulda, Germany
18 Dec 182423.1Ordained PriestPriest of Fulda, Germany
29 Mar 184846.4SelectedBishop of Fulda, Germany
11 Dec 184847.1ConfirmedBishop of Fulda, Germany
1 May 184947.5Ordained BishopBishop of Fulda, Germany
14 Oct 187371.9DiedBishop of Fulda, Germany

MicroData Summary for Christoph Florentius Kött:
Bishop Christoph Florentius Kött (born , died ) Bishop of Fulda

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 277

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013