Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Louis Aloise von Hommer

Deceased

Bishop of Trier


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1760BornKoblenz
14 Jun 178323.2Ordained PriestPriest of Trier, Germany
3 May 182464.1AppointedBishop of Trier, Germany
24 Aug 182464.4Ordained BishopBishop of Trier, Germany
11 Nov 183676.6DiedBishop of Trier, Germany

MicroData Summary for Joseph Louis Aloise von Hommer:
Bishop Joseph Louis Aloise von Hommer (born , died ) Bishop of Trier

  • a priest for 53.4 years
  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 376

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 10 Jan 2014