Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ferdinand August Maria Joseph Anton Spiegel zum Desenberg

Deceased

Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1764BornCanstein
6 Dec 179934.9Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
20 Dec 182459.9AppointedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
11 Jun 182560.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
2 Aug 183570.6DiedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Ferdinand August Maria Joseph Anton Spiegel zum Desenberg (VIAF: 54943928)
Archbishop Ferdinand August Maria Joseph Anton Spiegel zum Desenberg (born , died ) Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}

  • a priest for 35.6 years
  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 156
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1825, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 19 Jun 2016