Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Max Franz (Maximilian Franciscus) von Habsburg-Lothringen (Österreich)

Deceased

Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}

Bishop of Münster


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1756BornWien
7 Aug 178023.6SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
16 Aug 178023.6SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Münster, Germany
27 Sep 178023.8ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
27 Sep 178023.8ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Münster, Germany
15 Apr 178427.3SucceededArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
15 Apr 178427.3SucceededBishop of Münster, Germany
21 Dec 178428.0Ordained PriestPriest
8 May 178528.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
27 Jul 180144.6DiedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Max Franz (Maximilian Franciscus) von Habsburg-Lothringen (Österreich)
Archbishop Max Franz (Maximilian Franciscus) von Habsburg-Lothringen (Österreich) (born , died ) Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}

  • a priest for 16.5 years
  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1785, Number 20
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 173, and Page 293

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 6 Mar 2016