Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karl Aloys von Königsegg und Rothenfels

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}

Titular Bishop of Myrina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1726³BornAulendorf
22 Mar 175023.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
25 Mar 175023.4Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
12 Mar 177043.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
12 Mar 177043.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Myrina
22 Apr 177043.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Myrina
24 Feb 179669.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Karl Aloys von Königsegg und Rothenfels:
Bishop Karl Aloys von Königsegg und Rothenfels (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1770, Number 19
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 299, and Page 452

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 16 Jan 2016