Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karl Adalbert von Beyer, O. Praem. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}

Titular Bishop of Sebaste in Palaestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Feb 1764BornHerzogenbusch
178217.8ProfessedMember of Order of the Canons Regular of Premontre; Norbertines
24 Mar 178723.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Canons Regular of Premontre; Norbertines
180641.8IncardinatedPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
3 Jul 182662.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
3 Jul 182662.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Palaestina
1 May 182763.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Palaestina
21 Apr 184278.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Karl Adalbert von Beyer:
Bishop Karl Adalbert von Beyer O. Praem. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}

  • a priest for 55.1 years
  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 332

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013