Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilhelm Arnold Günther, O. Praem. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Trier

Titular Bishop of Sion


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1763BornKoblenz
178218.1ProfessedMember of Order of the Canons Regular of Premontre; Norbertines
22 Sep 178723.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Canons Regular of Premontre; Norbertines
180339.1IncardinatedPriest of Trier, Germany
23 Jun 183470.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany
23 Jun 183470.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Sion
14 Sep 183470.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sion
22 Aug 184379.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany

MicroData Summary for Wilhelm Arnold Günther (VIAF: 35251309)
Bishop Wilhelm Arnold Günther O. Praem. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Trier

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 8.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 347
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1834, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 14 Aug 2016