Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Wilhelm Bausch

Deceased

Bishop of Limburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1774BornSteinbach
17 Dec 179622.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Trier, Germany
15 Apr 179723.0Ordained PriestPriest of Trier, Germany
182752.7IncardinatedPriest of Limburg, Germany
8 Jan 183459.8SelectedBishop of Limburg, Germany
30 Sep 183460.5ConfirmedBishop of Limburg, Germany
25 Jan 183560.8Ordained BishopBishop of Limburg, Germany
9 Apr 184066.0DiedBishop of Limburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Wilhelm Bausch (VIAF: 52888344)
Bishop Johann Wilhelm Bausch (born , died ) Bishop of Limburg

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,209
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 239
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1835, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 14 Aug 2016