Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hermann von Vicari

Deceased

Archbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1773BornAulendorf
1 Oct 179724.3Ordained PriestPriest of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
182147.6IncardinatedPriest of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
24 Feb 183258.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
24 Feb 183258.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Macri
8 Apr 183258.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Macri
15 Jun 184269.0SelectedArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
30 Jan 184369.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
26 Mar 184369.8InstalledArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
14 Apr 186894.9DiedArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Hermann von Vicari:
Archbishop Hermann von Vicari (born , died ) Archbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau

  • a priest for 70.5 years
  • a bishop for 36.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 198, and Page 248

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013