Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josef von Lipp

Deceased

Bishop of Rottenburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1795BornHolzhausen
18 Sep 181924.5Ordained PriestPriest of Rottenburg, Germany
14 Jun 184752.2SelectedBishop of Rottenburg, Germany
17 Dec 184752.7ConfirmedBishop of Rottenburg, Germany
12 Mar 184853.0Ordained BishopBishop of Rottenburg, Germany
19 Mar 184853.0InstalledBishop of Rottenburg, Germany
3 May 186974.1DiedBishop of Rottenburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Josef von Lipp:
Bishop Josef von Lipp (born , died ) Bishop of Rottenburg

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 486

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013