Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nikolaus von Weis

Deceased

Bishop of Speyer


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1796BornRimlingen
16 May 181822.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Speyer, Germany
22 Aug 181822.4Ordained PriestPriest of Speyer, Germany
5 Mar 184245.9SelectedBishop of Speyer, Germany
23 May 184246.2ConfirmedBishop of Speyer, Germany
10 Jul 184246.3Ordained BishopBishop of Speyer, Germany
13 Dec 186973.7DiedBishop of Speyer, Germany

MicroData Summary for Nikolaus von Weis (VIAF: 69697579)
Bishop Nikolaus von Weis (born , died ) Bishop of Speyer

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 351
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1842, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 21 Nov 2016