Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lothar Anselm von Gebsattel

Deceased

Archbishop of München und Freising {Munich}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1761BornWürzburg
22 Nov 179635.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Würzburg, Germany
6 Dec 179635.9Ordained PriestPriest of Würzburg, Germany
5 Feb 181857.0SelectedArchbishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
25 May 181857.3ConfirmedArchbishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
1 Nov 182160.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
1 Oct 184685.7DiedArchbishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Lothar Anselm von Gebsattel:
Archbishop Lothar Anselm von Gebsattel (born , died ) Archbishop of München und Freising {Munich}

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 268

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013