Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georg Michael Wittmann

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Regensburg

Titular Bishop of Miletopolis

Titular See: (died before papal confirmation)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1760BornPleystein
21 Dec 178222.9Ordained PriestPriest of Regensburg, Germany
21 May 182969.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany
21 May 182969.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Comana Armeniae
28 Jun 182969.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Comana Armeniae
14 Mar 183171.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Miletopolis
25 Jul 183272.5SelectedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
8 Mar 183373.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Georg Michael Wittmann:
Bishop Georg Michael Wittmann (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Regensburg

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 157, and Page 264
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 318

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013