Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignatz Albert (Joseph Ignatz Alexius) von Riegg, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Augsburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1767BornLandsberg/Lech
178517.5ProfessedMember of Order of St. Augustine
29 May 179022.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of St. Augustine
18 Sep 179023.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
10 Mar 182456.7SelectedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
24 May 182456.9ConfirmedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
11 Jul 182457.0Ordained BishopBishop of Augsburg, Germany
15 Aug 183669.1DiedBishop of Augsburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Ignatz Albert (Joseph Ignatz Alexius) von Riegg:
Bishop Ignatz Albert (Joseph Ignatz Alexius) von Riegg O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Augsburg

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 95

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013