Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Michael von Sailer

Deceased

Bishop of Regensburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1751³BornAresing
23 Sep 177523.8Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
27 Sep 182270.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Regensburg, Germany
27 Sep 182270.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Germanicopolis
28 Oct 182270.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Germanicopolis
23 Oct 182977.9SucceededBishop of Regensburg, Germany
29 Oct 182977.9InstalledBishop of Regensburg, Germany
20 May 183280.5DiedBishop of Regensburg, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Michael von Sailer:
Bishop Johann Michael von Sailer (born , died ) Bishop of Regensburg

  • a priest for 56.7 years
  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 203, and Page 318

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013