Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Melchior Ferdinand Joseph Cardinal von Diepenbrock

Deceased

Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1798Born
27 Dec 182325.9Ordained PriestPriest of Regensburg, Germany
15 Jan 184547.0SelectedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
21 Apr 184547.2ConfirmedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
8 Jun 184547.4Ordained BishopBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
30 Sep 185052.7Elevated to Cardinal
20 Jan 185355.0DiedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

MicroData Summary for Melchior Ferdinand Joseph von Diepenbrock (VIAF: 64801460)
Melchior Ferdinand Joseph Cardinal von Diepenbrock (born , died ) Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBocholt, Diocese of Münster, Germany
Ordained PriestRegensburg, Diocese of Regensburg, Germany
Ordained BishopCathedral, Salzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg, Austria
Death PlaceCastle of Johannesberg, Breslau, Diocese of Wrocław (Breslau)
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Breslau, Diocese of Wrocław (Breslau)

  • a priest for 29.0 years
  • a bishop for 7.6 years
  • a cardinal for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 400
  • c34: CB, 12 Jan 2016
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 30 Sep 1850
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1845, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018