Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Aloys Hoffmann

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Salzburg

Titular Bishop of Dulma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1780BornRegensburg
18 Sep 180222.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Salzburg, Austria
4 Jun 180322.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
6 Apr 183554.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Salzburg, Austria
6 Apr 183554.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Dulma
14 Jun 183554.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dulma
24 Apr 184867.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Johann Aloys Hoffmann (VIAF: 233305515)
Bishop Johann Aloys Hoffmann (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Salzburg

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 181
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1835, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 30 Nov 2016