Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Sigismund Anton von Hohenwart, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Wien {Vienna}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1730BornGerlachstein (Krain)
3 Nov 174616.5ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
24 Sep 175929.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Society of Jesus
7 Oct 175929.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
177746.6IncardinatedPriest of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
10 Feb 179160.7SelectedBishop of Trieste, Italy
26 Sep 179161.3ConfirmedBishop of Trieste, Italy
23 Oct 179161.4Ordained BishopBishop of Trieste, Italy
10 Jan 179463.6SelectedBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
12 Sep 179464.3ConfirmedBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
16 Nov 179464.5InstalledBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
29 Apr 180372.9SelectedArchbishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
20 Jun 180373.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
24 Aug 180373.3InstalledArchbishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
29 Jun 182090.1DiedArchbishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

MicroData Summary for Sigismund Anton von Hohenwart
Archbishop Sigismund Anton von Hohenwart S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop of Wien {Vienna}

  • a priest for 60.7 years
  • a bishop for 28.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,502
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 396
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 13
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 237, and Page 397

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 16 May 2016