Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthias Paul Steindl

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}

Titular Bishop of Antaeopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1761BornWieden
20 Jul 178826.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
27 Jul 178826.8Ordained PriestPriest of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
14 Apr 181755.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
14 Apr 181755.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Antaeopolis
15 May 181755.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antaeopolis
2 May 182866.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

MicroData Summary for Matthias Paul Steindl (VIAF: 304306132)
Bishop Matthias Paul Steindl (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}

  • a priest for 39.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1817, Number 13
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 79

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 Oct 2016