Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Nepomuk von Dankesreither

Deceased

Bishop of Sankt Pölten


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1750³BornWien
176817.9ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
14 Mar 177222.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Saint Benedict
6 Mar 177323.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
178332.9IncardinatedPriest of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
24 Aug 180757.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
24 Aug 180757.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Pella
8 Nov 180757.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pella
30 Jun 181666.4SelectedBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
23 Sep 181666.7ConfirmedBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
24 Nov 181666.8InstalledBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
10 Jun 182373.4DiedBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Nepomuk von Dankesreither:
Bishop Johann Nepomuk von Dankesreither (born , died ) Bishop of Sankt Pölten

  • a priest for 50.3 years
  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 216, and Page 301

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013