Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nikolaus Rauscher

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom

Titular Bishop of Evaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1759³BornStompfa
14 Sep 178525.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
2 Oct 178525.8Ordained PriestPriest
16 Mar 180848.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary
16 Mar 180848.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Evaria
8 May 180848.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Evaria
1815¹55.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nikolaus Rauscher:
Bishop Nikolaus Rauscher (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom

  • a priest for 29.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 190

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013