Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Ljubljana

Archidioecesis Labacensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Stanislav (Stane) Zore, O.F.M., Archbishop
  • Anton Jamnik, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Franc Šuštar, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Anton Stres, C.M., Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 22 December 1961
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Slovenia
  • Square Kilometers: 5,608 (2,166 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://nadskofija-ljubljana.si/
  • Mailing Address: Nadskofijski ordinariat, Ciril-Metodov trg 4, p.p. 1990, 1001 Ljubljana, Slovenija
  • Telephone: (01)2342.600
  • Fax: 2314.169

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach)
6 December 1461ErectedPatriarchate of Aquileia Diocese of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach) (erected)
Archdiocese of Ljubljana
8 March 1788ElevatedDiocese of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach) Archdiocese of Ljubljana
Diocese of Ljubljana
19 August 1807ElevatedArchdiocese of Ljubljana Diocese of Ljubljana ((from Archdiocese to Diocese))
25 April 1925Territory LostDiocese of Ljubljana
Apostolic Administration of Fiume / Rijeka
Diocese of Trieste e Capodistria (Trst i Koper)
Diocese of Rijeka (-Opatija)
Archdiocese of Ljubljana
22 December 1961ElevatedDiocese of Ljubljana Archdiocese of Ljubljana
22 November 1968ElevatedArchdiocese of Ljubljana (became a Metropolitan)
7 April 2006Territory LostArchdiocese of Ljubljana Diocese of Novo Mesto (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach)
1950520,000521,57199.7%6141767906583261,310285ap1951
Archdiocese of Ljubljana
Diocese of Ljubljana
Archdiocese of Ljubljana
1970650,584697,00093.3%3151354501,4451293723290ap1971
1980700,000808,00086.6%3631595221,340271720288ap1981
1990718,966884,17281.3%3591695281,3616266610300ap1991
1999703,450883,17579.7%3651765411,3005251553305ap2000
2000707,417885,62879.9%3841755591,2655248557306ap2001
2001710,877892,68679.6%3781735511,2906232566306ap2002
2002733,394905,82981.0%3881745621,3045231582306ap2003
2003715,084906,43078.9%3881755631,2704231540306ap2004
2004715,000914,68478.2%3981785761,2414234525306ap2005
2012561,600772,10672.7%2881434311,30321179380234ap2013
2013554,417776,33671.4%2881404281,29521189357234ap2014
2016553,661791,35170.0%2801384181,32420176315234ap2017
2019545,111800,58568.1%2551383931,38719165294234ap2020

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach)
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 171

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.7, 8 May 2021; Data: 1 Jul 2021

Quantcast