Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Rijeka

Archidioecesis Fluminensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Ivan Devcic, Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Split: 25 May 2000
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Croatia
  • Square Kilometers: 2,580 (996 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.rijeka-nadbiskupija.com/
  • Mailing Address: Nadbiskupski Ordinarijat, Ivana Pavla II 1, 51000 Rijeka, Hrvatska
  • Telephone: (051)581.210
  • Fax: 581.215

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Apostolic Administration of Rijeka
30 April 1920ErectedApostolic Administration of Rijeka (erected)
Diocese of Rijeka (-Opatija)
25 April 1925ElevatedApostolic Administration of Rijeka Diocese of Rijeka (-Opatija)
Archdiocese of Rijeka-Senj
27 July 1969UnitedDiocese of Rijeka (-Opatija)
Diocese of Senj (-Modruš)
Archdiocese of Rijeka-Senj
25 May 2000SplitArchdiocese of Rijeka-Senj Diocese of Gospić-Senj
Archdiocese of Rijeka
Archdiocese of Rijeka
25 May 2000SplitArchdiocese of Rijeka-Senj Diocese of Gospić-Senj
Archdiocese of Rijeka

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Rijeka-Senj
1950108,000110,00098.2%5713701,5421712032ap1951
1968110,000150,00073.3%1430442,5004217825ap1971
1980339,000462,00073.4%89581472,30677267169ap1981
1990299,000457,00065.4%100491492,00669234169ap1991
1999290,000390,00074.4%101531541,88371206172ap2000
Archdiocese of Rijeka
2000230,000300,00076.7%66571231,8697719589ap2001
2001198,500279,50071.0%61451061,8725219389ap2002
2002198,300289,05068.6%62481101,8025419090ap2003
2003213,650266,80080.1%64471111,9245318690ap2004
2004213,650266,80080.1%67401071,9964717890ap2005
2010213,650266,80080.1%76441201,7805016490ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.3, 15 Nov 2014; Data: 15 Dec 2014