Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Karlo Jamnik

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Rijeka (-Opatija), Croatia

Titular See: (Slovenian and Croatian portions)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1891Born
1916²24.3Ordained PriestPriest of Trieste e Capodistria (Trst i Koper), Italy
3 Aug 194755.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Rijeka (-Opatija), Croatia
3 Nov 194958.1DiedApostolic Administrator of Rijeka (-Opatija), Croatia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Karlo Jamnik
Father Karlo Jamnik (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Rijeka (-Opatija)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrankovo, Diocese of Ljubljana, Slovenia
Death PlaceTrnovo, Ilirsa Bistrica

  • a priest for 33.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 29 Jul 2020
  • ln: CB, 10 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast