Date | Event | From | To |
---|---|---|---|
Delegation to China | |||
11 August 1922 | Established | Delegation to China | |
Nunciature to China | |||
6 July 1946 | Elevated | Delegation to China | Nunciature to China (to Internunciature) |
24 December 1966 | Elevated | Nunciature to China (to Nunciature) |
|
![]()
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
![]() |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023 Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 19 Jun 2023 |
✠