Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Cardinal Riberi

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Spain

Cardinal-Priest of San Girolamo della Carità


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1897Born
29 Jun 192225.0Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
13 Aug 193437.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Dara
24 Sep 193437.2AppointedApostolic Delegate to Africa for the Missions
28 Oct 193437.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Dara
193941.5AppointedOfficial of the Secretariat of State
6 Jul 194649.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to China
195153.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to China
19 Feb 195961.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Ireland
28 Apr 196264.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
26 Jun 196770.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Girolamo della Carità
26 Jun 196770.0Elevated to Cardinal
26 Jun 196770.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
16 Dec 196770.5DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Riberi (VIAF: 167252672)
Antonio Cardinal Riberi (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Spain

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontecarlo, Monaco

  • a priest for 45.4 years
  • a bishop for 33.1 years
  • a cardinal for .4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 73
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 93

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast