Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Han Tingbi (Ting-pi)

Deceased

Bishop of Hongdong [Hungtung], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1908Born
22 Jul 193426.4Ordained PriestPriest
194940.8AppointedPro-Prefect of Hungtung [Hongdong], China
18 Apr 195042.1AppointedBishop of Hongdong [Hungtung], China
9 Jul 195042.3Ordained BishopBishop of Hongdong [Hungtung], China
21 Dec 199183.8DiedBishop of Hongdong [Hungtung], China

MicroData Summary for Francis Han Tingbi (Ting-pi)
Bishop Francis Han Tingbi (Ting-pi) (born , died ) Bishop of Hongdong [Hungtung]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopShanghai

  • a priest for 57.4 years
  • a bishop for 41.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd/op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,950, Number 48
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 8 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast