Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Li Weidao

Deceased

Bishop of Changzhi [Luan], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1919Born
14 Jul 194627.1Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jul 198263.1Ordained BishopBishop of Changzhi [Luan], China
21 Jul 199879.1DiedBishop of Changzhi [Luan], China

MicroData Summary for Anthony Li Weidao
Bishop Anthony Li Weidao (born , died ) Bishop of Changzhi [Luan]

  • a priest for 52.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 19
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 23 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast