Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ermenegildus (Paul) Li Yi, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Changzhi [Luan], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1923Born
1943²19.1EnteredMember of Order of Friars Minor
6 Feb 194925.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
28 Jan 199874.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Changzhi [Luan], China
21 Jul 199874.6SucceededBishop of Changzhi [Luan], China
24 May 201288.5DiedBishop of Changzhi [Luan], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ermenegildus (Paul) Li Yi
Bishop Ermenegildus (Paul) Li Yi O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Changzhi [Luan]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChangzhi, Diocese of Changzhi [Luan]

  • a priest for 63.2 years
  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Dec 2019
  • b/c2: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 85

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast